+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 5/901 - from Ch. 120, par. 9-901
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor