+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 8, 2007 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia