+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On October 21, 2009 in the House:
- Reduction Veto Stands 96-0113
On October 5, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Reduction Veto October 14, 2009
On July 31, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Reduction Veto PA 96-0113
- Effective Date July 31, 2009
On June 29, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 037-022-000
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2009
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 21, 2009
- Do Pass Appropriations I; 007-005-000
- Waive Posting Notice
- Assigned to Appropriations I
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-007-005
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 017-002-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gary Hannig
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes appropriations to the Illinois State Board of Education. Effective July 1, 2009.