+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 2, 2003 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0081
- Effective Date July 2, 2003
- Governor Approved
On June 5, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Education; 008-000-000
On April 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On April 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 27, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 017-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 016-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 17, 2003 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Watson
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the certificate shall be renewed if the certificate holder has completed his or her certificate renewal plan before July 1, 2002 (instead of requiring the certificate holder to have earned 120 continuing professional development units before July 1, 2002).
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/21-14 - from Ch. 122, par. 21-14