+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 7, 2005 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0124
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2006
On June 9, 2005 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2005 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2005
- Second Reading
On April 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2005
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 010-000-000
On April 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Chavez
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 13, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Delgado
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2005: HB0210 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 11, 2005
February 8, 2005: HB0210 - Third Reading - Tuesday, February 08, 2005
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor