+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- To Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 20 ILCS 2610/14 - from Ch. 121, par. 307.14
- 50 ILCS 725/3.8 - from Ch. 85, par. 2561
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor