+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/34-3.3 -
- 105 ILCS 5/34-6 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor