+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
On August 22, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0443
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 1, 2020
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 081-030-000
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 005-002-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 045-013-000
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Katie Stuart
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 011-002-000
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
- Do Pass Education; 013-003-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 079-031-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Removed from Short Debate Status
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 005-002-000
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following change: provides that, on or before January 31, 2020, the Professional Review Panel must submit a report to the General Assembly on how State funds and funds distributed under the evidence-based funding formula may aid the financial effects of the changes made by the amendatory Act.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/24-8 - from Ch. 122, par. 24-8
+ − Votes (7)
June 1, 2019: SFA0001 - Concurrence
May 30, 2019: SFA0001 - Elem Sec Ed: Adm., Lic. & Charter
May 29, 2019: HB2078 - Third Reading
May 28, 2019: SFA0001 - Education
May 1, 2019: HB2078 - Education
April 9, 2019: HB2078 - Third Reading
March 6, 2019: HB2078 - Elem Sec Ed: Adm., Lic. & Charter
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor