+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 35 ILCS 173/5-50 -
- 35 ILCS 615/1 - from Ch. 120, par. 467.16
- 35 ILCS 640/2-4 -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor