+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
- Motion Prevailed
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Jim Watson
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment & Energy Committee
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Watson
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Watson
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor