+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0011
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date May 10, 2013
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2013
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass Appropriations I; 010-000-000
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Waive Posting Notice
- Assigned to Appropriations I
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-002-000
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends Public Act 97-730 by changing an appropriation to the Department on Aging and adding an appropriation to the Department of Healthcare and Family Services Effective immediately.
+ − Votes (2)
April 25, 2013: HB0207 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 25, 2013
April 18, 2013: HB0207 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 18, 2013
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor