+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol A. Sente
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol A. Sente
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor