+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 005-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 006-001-001
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 006-001-000
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; by Voice Vote
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following change: Restores current law prohibiting an institution of higher learning from requiring an applicant to complete the test of basic skills prior to the semester before student teaching or prior to the semester before starting the final semester of an internship (rather than prior to completing a semester of student teaching or of an internship). Effective immediately.