+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 430 ILCS 65/4 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-4
- 430 ILCS 65/8 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-8