+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-1032
- Effective Date February 17, 2009
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Assigned to Pensions and Investments
- Waive Posting Notice
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As January 13, 2009
- Do Pass Pensions and Investments; 007-000-000
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2009
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 19, 2008
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 20, 2008
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 29, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel and Pensions Committee; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 23, 2008
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kevin Joyce
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin Joyce
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard T. Bradley
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Downstate Firefighter Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that, in the event a firefighter began employment with a new employer as a result of an intergovernmental agreement that resulted in the elimination of the previous employer's fire department, the firefighter shall not be required to have 7 years of creditable service with the last pension fund to qualify for a disability pension. Requires the firefighter to have 7 years of total combined creditable service time to qualify for a disability pension. Provides that the disability pension shall be paid by the previous employer and new employer in proportion to the firefighter's years of service with each employer. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 40 ILCS 5/7-139 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 7-139