+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 20 ILCS 1605/2 - from Ch. 120, par. 1152
- 20 ILCS 1605/9.1 -
- 20 ILCS 1605/20 - from Ch. 120, par. 1170
- 20 ILCS 1605/21.12 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.891 new -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor