+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 19, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsors (60)
Type:
Primary Sponsor