+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Lost 047-068-000
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
- Do Pass / Standard Debate Human Services Committee; 006-005-000
- Remains in Human Services Committee
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Human Services Committee; 004-005-000
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William D. Burns
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 720 ILCS 5/24-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 24-3
- 720 ILCS 5/24-3.1A new -
+ − Vote
April 13, 2011: HB0203 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 13, 2011
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor