+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 625 ILCS 5/6-106.1 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-106.1
- 625 ILCS 5/6-508 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-508
- 720 ILCS 5/33A-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 33A-3
- 720 ILCS 5/24-1.7 rep. -
- 725 ILCS 5/111-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 111-3
- 730 ILCS 5/3-2-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-2-2
- 730 ILCS 5/3-3-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-3-3
- 730 ILCS 5/3-6-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-6-3
- 730 ILCS 5/5-4.5-95 rep. -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor