+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert F. Flider
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; 017-000-000
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert F. Flider
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor