+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0501
- Effective Date March 18, 2016
- Governor Approved
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 4, 2015
On October 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On October 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Lost; 000-039-020
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2015
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Donne E. Trotter
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2015
- Second Reading
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2015
- Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 014-000-000
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 2310/2310-371.5 - was 20 ILCS 2310/371
+ − Votes (5)
January 13, 2016: HB0200 - Third Reading - Wednesday, January 13, 2016
May 27, 2015: SFA0001 - Amendment - Wednesday, May 27, 2015
April 15, 2015: HB0200 - State Government & Veterans Affairs - Apr 15, 2015
March 12, 2015: HB0200 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 12, 2015
March 4, 2015: HB0200 - State Government Administration - Mar 04, 2015
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor