+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 2, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-006-025
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard T. Bradley
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert S. Molaro
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Ralph C. Capparelli
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 009-000-004
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 17, 2002 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Removes a provision that allows the Illinois Student Assistance Commission to make payments directly to the scholarship recipient.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 26, 2003: HB0020 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 26, 2003
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor