+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0047
- Effective Date July 1, 2013
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2013
- Second Reading
- Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2013
- Waive Posting Notice
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2013
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 014-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. David McSweeney
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 020-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Grant Funds Recovery Act. Authorizes the Governor to create the Illinois Single Audit Commission. Sets forth appointment procedures. Requires the Commission to conduct research regarding the practices of other states in the administration of grants and to create a report summarizing the Commission's recommendations regarding uniform standards for the administration of grants in this State. Requires the report to include statutory and rule change proposals that shall primarily focus on developing a coordinated, non-redundant process for the provision of effective and efficient oversight of grant recipients, ensuring quality programs, and limiting fraud, waste, and abuse. Provides specific areas of focus within each stage of the life cycle of a grant. Requires the report to be filed with the General Assembly by January 1, 2014 and adds a January 1, 2015 repealer. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of House Amendment No. 2 with the following changes. Specifies the grant-making Departments that shall have a representative on the Commission. Makes other changes to the composition of the Commission. Makes changes to the requirements of the contents of the Commission's report. Provides that the Commission shall operate with no direct costs to the State. Repeals the provisions regarding the Commission on April 1, 2014 (rather than January 1, 2015). Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 30 ILCS 705/4 - from Ch. 127, par. 2304
- 30 ILCS 705/11 - from Ch. 127, par. 2311
- 30 ILCS 705/15 new -