+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tim Ozinga
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Ozinga
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 5 ILCS 100/1-1 - from Ch. 127, par. 1001-1
+ − Vote
March 11, 2021: HB1995 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor