+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ***
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ***
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
+ − Vote
March 27, 2019: HB1985 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor