+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate **
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Standard Debate Executive Committee; 008-006-000
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 11, 2021: HB1982 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor