+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson