+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (64)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0625
- Effective Date June 1, 2008
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 098-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 098-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 22, 2007
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 15, 2007
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Ruth Munson
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Ruth Munson
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2,3
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Mur phy
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon-Raoul
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon; -Raoul
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary Criminal Law
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary Criminal Law
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary Criminal Law; 006-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary Criminal Law; 006-000-000
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2007
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Millner
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
- Sponsor Removed Sen. John J. Millner
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Millner
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2007
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 010-000-000
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Rules
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 115-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-005-001
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Remains in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes the amendatory changes to the child abduction statute. Eliminates as an element of the offense of luring a minor that the offender must be a stranger to the minor. Eliminates for a second or subsequent offense of luring a minor that the offender must serve a mandatory minimum term of imprisonment of 90 days in the county jail or county Department of Corrections.
House Committee Amendment No. 2
Deletes the provisions of the amendatory Act relating to luring a minor. Creates the offense of luring of a minor. Provides various penalties for a stranger to the parent or legal guardian of a minor contacting or communicating electronically with the minor under 15 years of age without the express consent of the parent or legal guardian of the minor with the intent to persuade, lure, or transport the minor away from his or her home, or other location known by the minor's parent or legal guardian to be the place where the minor is to be located. Establishes penalties.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Makes the elements of the offense of luring a minor when the offender is 21 years of age or older identical to the elements of the offense if the offender is at least 18 years of age but under 21 years of age. Defines "unlawful purpose" to include only misdemeanor or felony violations. Defines stranger to include a person under 21 years of age.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Makes the elements of the offense of luring a minor when the offender is 21 years of age or older identical to the elements of the offense if the offender is at least 18 years of age but under 21 years of age. Defines "unlawful purpose" to include only misdemeanor or felony violations. Defines stranger to include a person under 21 years of age.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 720 ILCS 5/10-5 - from Ch. 38, par. 10-5
- 720 ILCS 5/10-5.1 new -
- 730 ILCS 5/3-6-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-6-3
- 730 ILCS 150/2 - from Ch. 38, par. 222