+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with provisions that are substantially similar except that it provides that in appropriate circumstances, visitation may include electronic communication under conditions and at times determined by the court.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 750 ILCS 5/607 - from Ch. 40, par. 607
- 750 ILCS 5/609 - from Ch. 40, par. 609