+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Harry R. Ramey, Jr.
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
+ − Statute Amended
- 55 ILCS 5/6-20001 - from Ch. 34, par. 6-20001
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor