+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; 011-002-001
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 5, 2007 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. James H. Meyer