+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 009-003-001
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: (1) provides that the portion of taxes levied which is attributable to annual inflationary increases (not less than zero) shall be allocated to a school district though an intergovernmental agreement with the sponsoring municipality; (2) deletes a provision narrowing the application of the new language to instances where there is an absence of tax increment allocation financing; (3) provides that the inflationary increase allocated to the school district shall be determined by the annual increase in the consumer price index-u; and (4) defines "consumer price index-u".
+ − Statute Amended
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-8 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-74.4-8