+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- To Executive Subcommittee on State Government Operations
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-000-000
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the introduced bill with changes. Adds 4 public members to the Illinois Commission on Fiscal Responsibility and Reform. Provides that the Speaker of the House, the House Minority Leader, the Senate President, and the Senate Minority Leader shall each appoint one of the public members. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Vote
March 30, 2011: HB0197 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 30, 2011
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor