+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Remains in Human Services Committee
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Human Services Committee; 005-004-000
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor