+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On October 17, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0652
- Effective Date October 11, 2007
On October 11, 2007 in the House:
- Both Houses Override Total Veto
On October 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 056-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On October 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Larry K. Bomke
- Placed Calendar Total Veto October 11, 2007
On October 3, 2007 in the House:
- Override Governor Veto - House Passed 111-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On October 1, 2007 in the House:
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Raymond Poe
On September 19, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto October 2, 2007
On September 10, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Vetoed
On July 12, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 13, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 101-001-000
On June 8, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 15, 2007
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
On May 29, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Personnel and Pensions Committee; 005-000-000
On May 28, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On May 24, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Raymond Poe
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Do Pass as Amended Pensions and Investments; 006-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2007
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2007
- Second Reading
On May 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Pensions and Investments
On May 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Larry K. Bomke
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Pensions and Investments
On May 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-001-000
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 005-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel and Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Personnel and Pensions Committee
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Removes language exempting the changes from new benefit increase provisions.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Removes language exempting the changes from new benefit increase provisions.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/14-104 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 14-104
- 40 ILCS 5/14-152.1 -