+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 5, 2007 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. David Reis
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 17, 2007: HB0196 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 17, 2007
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor