+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 007-000-000
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- 40 ILCS 5/2-103.1 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/2-103.2 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/2-117.4 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/2-126 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 2-126
- 40 ILCS 5/2-126.2 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/2-162.1 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/18-118.1 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/18-118.2 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/18-120.2 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/18-133 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 18-133
- 40 ILCS 5/18-133.2 new -
- 40 ILCS 5/18-169.1 new -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor