+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (62)
On August 25, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0362
- Effective Date August 25, 2017
- Governor Approved
On August 4, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On July 6, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 106-005-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
On July 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As July 4, 2017
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Althoff
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On July 4, 2017 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mike Fortner
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mike Fortner
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
On July 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As July 1, 2017
On June 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 30, 2017
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2017
- Second Reading
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Insurance
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 004-000-000
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Wheeler
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ***
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
+ − Statutes Amended (17)
- 215 ILCS 5/1 - from Ch. 73, par. 613
- 215 ILCS 110/32 - from Ch. 32, par. 690.32
- 100SB1417enr., Sec. 1-5 -
- 100SB1417enr., Sec. 1-10 -
- 100SB1417enr., Sec. 1-15 -
- 100SB1417enr., Sec. 1-20 -
- 100SB1417enr., Sec. 1-25 -
- 100SB1417enr., Sec. 1-30 -
- 100SB1417enr., Sec. 1-35 -
- 100SB1417enr., Sec. 1-40 -
- 100SB1417enr., Sec. 1-45 -
- 100SB1417enr., Sec. 1-50 -
- 100SB1417enr., Sec. 1-55 -
- S.B. 1417, 100th G.A., Sec. 1-84 new -
- 100SB1417enr., Sec. 1-85 -
- 100SB1417enr, Sec. 1-60 rep. -
- 415 ILCS 150/100 -
+ − Votes (7)
July 6, 2017: SFA0001 - Concurrence
July 4, 2017: HB1955 - Third Reading
June 29, 2017: SFA0001 - Environment and Conservation
April 28, 2017: HB1955 - Third Reading
April 28, 2017: HFA0002 - Health Care Availability & Access
April 25, 2017: HFA0001 - Health Care Availability & Access
March 29, 2017: HB1955 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor