+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0377
- Effective Date January 1, 2012
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2011
- Do Pass Environment; 007-000-000
- Assigned to Environment
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 8, 2011
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 018-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment & Energy Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment & Energy Committee
- Re-assigned to Environment & Energy Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Amends the Drycleaner Environmental Response Trust Fund Act. Removes a provision prohibiting a claimant who has requested reimbursement from the remedial action account from receiving the requested reimbursement if he or she has filed for bankruptcy on or after the discovery of a release of drycleaning solvents. Requires, beginning January 1, 2012, each active drycleaning facility that has previously received or is currently receiving reimbursement for the costs of a remedial action to maintain continuous financial assurance for environmental liability coverage in the amount of at least $500,000 until the earlier of: (i) January 1, 2020 or (ii) the date the Drycleaner Environmental Response Trust Fund Council determines that the drycleaning facility is an inactive drycleaning facility. Revokes, and prevents the renewal of, the licenses of facilities that do not maintain the required financial assurance. Authorizes payment of license fees by credit card.
+ − Statute Amended
- 415 ILCS 5/1 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1001