+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 16, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0192
- Effective Date August 16, 2007
- Governor Approved
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2007
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 006-000-000
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary Criminal Law
On April 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary Criminal Law
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 23, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 4, 2007 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- New Act -
- 20 ILCS 2605/2605-375 - was 20 ILCS 2605/55a in part
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2007: HB0194 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 22, 2007
February 22, 2007: HB0194 - Third Reading - Thursday, February 22, 2007
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor