+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Environment & Energy Committee
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Roger L. Eddy
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -