+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 14, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0153
- Effective Date January 1, 2008
- Governor Approved
On June 15, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2007
- Second Reading
On April 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2007
- Do Pass Education; 009-000-000
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 019-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Changes references from "agriculture education" to "agriculture science". Provides that the agricultural science (instead of agricultural education) teacher education training continuum required to be developed by the State Board of Education shall begin at the secondary level.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Changes references from "agriculture education" to "agriculture science". Provides that the agricultural science (instead of agricultural education) teacher education training continuum required to be developed by the State Board of Education shall begin at the secondary level.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 17, 2007: HB1922 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 17, 2007
March 22, 2007: HB1922 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 22, 2007
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor