+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
- Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. William R. Haine
- Placed Calendar Total Veto October 11, 2007
- Override Governor Veto - House Passed 110-003-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto October 2, 2007
- Governor Vetoed
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 102-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 15, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2007
- Second Reading
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2007
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 009-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
- Assigned to Revenue
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Fire Protection; 006-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Fire Protection; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Fire Protection
- Assigned to Fire Protection
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions creating the Small Fire-fighting Equipment Grant Program and the Fire Service and Small Equipment Fund. Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that a Section allowing the Governor to direct the State Treasurer and Comptroller to transfer a specified sum from any fund held by the State Treasurer to the General Revenue Fund in order to help defray the State's operating costs for the fiscal year does not apply to the Fire Service and Small Equipment Fund, the Fire Truck Revolving Loan Fund, or the Ambulance Revolving Loan Fund. Amends the Cigarette Tax Act. Provides that beginning on July 1, 2007, certain moneys received by the Department of Revenue under the Act and under the Cigarette Use Tax Act shall be deposited into the Fire Service and Small Equipment Fund, the Fire Truck Revolving Loan Fund, and the Ambulance Revolving Loan Fund. Effective July 1, 2007.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions creating the Small Fire-fighting Equipment Grant Program and the Fire Service and Small Equipment Fund. Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that a Section allowing the Governor to direct the State Treasurer and Comptroller to transfer a specified sum from any fund held by the State Treasurer to the General Revenue Fund in order to help defray the State's operating costs for the fiscal year does not apply to the Fire Service and Small Equipment Fund, the Fire Truck Revolving Loan Fund, or the Ambulance Revolving Loan Fund. Amends the Cigarette Tax Act. Provides that beginning on July 1, 2007, certain moneys received by the Department of Revenue under the Act and under the Cigarette Use Tax Act shall be deposited into the Fire Service and Small Equipment Fund, the Fire Truck Revolving Loan Fund, and the Ambulance Revolving Loan Fund. Effective July 1, 2007.