+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On January 10, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On November 30, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 10, 2008
On November 2, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2007
On October 12, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 2, 2007
On October 5, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 12, 2007
On September 5, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 5, 2007
On August 24, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 5, 2007
On August 17, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 24, 2007
On August 10, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 17, 2007
On August 4, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 10, 2007
On July 31, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 4, 2007
On June 30, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2007
On June 22, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2007
On June 15, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 22, 2007
On June 8, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 15, 2007
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
On May 29, 2007 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2007
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate DCFS Oversight Committee; 007-001-000
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to DCFS Oversight Committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 4, 2007 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 505/5 - from Ch. 23, par. 5005