+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-008-002
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Susana A Mendoza
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the date that the requirement that every person arrested for committing a felony shall have a sample of his or her saliva or tissue taken for DNA fingerprinting analysis becomes operative is no later than the earliest of the following: (1) 2 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act; (2) the date on which the Department of State Police informs law enforcement agencies that the Department is ready to collect samples; or (3) January 1, 2010 (rather than January 1, 2009). Provides that the provisions of the amendatory Act of the 95th General Assembly are severable.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 720 ILCS 5/31-4 - from Ch. 38, par. 31-4
- 725 ILCS 5/107-2.5 new -
- 730 ILCS 5/5-4-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-4-3
+ − Vote
March 28, 2007: HB1901 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 28, 2007
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor