+ − Summary
+ − Actions (41)
On May 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Legislation Considered in Special Session No. 1
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2020
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2019
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019
- Do Pass Education; 014-000-000
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
- Waive Posting Notice
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
- Re-assigned to Education
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2019
- Arrive in Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-022-000
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 008-000-000
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 008-000-000
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 18, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford