+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Tollway Oversight Committee; 009-000-000
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Tollway Oversight Committee
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
+ − Statutes Amended (30)
- 30 ILCS 500/1-15.107 -
- 30 ILCS 500/1-15.108 -
- 30 ILCS 500/20-120 -
- 30 ILCS 500/50-2 -
- 30 ILCS 500/50-35 -
- 605 ILCS 10/2 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-2
- 605 ILCS 10/3 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-3
- 605 ILCS 10/4 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-4
- 605 ILCS 10/5 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-5
- 605 ILCS 10/6 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-6
- 605 ILCS 10/7 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-7
- 605 ILCS 10/8 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-8
- 605 ILCS 10/9 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-9
- 605 ILCS 10/9.5 -
- 605 ILCS 10/10 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-10
- 605 ILCS 10/16 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-16
- 605 ILCS 10/17 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-17
- 605 ILCS 10/19 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-19
- 605 ILCS 10/21 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-21
- 605 ILCS 10/24 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-24
- 605 ILCS 10/26 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-26
- 605 ILCS 10/29 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-29
- 605 ILCS 10/34 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-34
- 605 ILCS 10/9.60 rep. -
- 605 ILCS 10/16.1 rep. -
- 605 ILCS 10/16.2 rep. -
- 605 ILCS 10/16.3 rep. -
- 605 ILCS 10/18 rep. -
- 605 ILCS 10/33 rep. -
- 605 ILCS 10/35 rep. -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor