+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
- Referred to Assignments
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021
- Arrive in Senate
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Executive Committee; 015-000-000
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain
+ − Votes (2)
April 21, 2021: HB1883 - Third Reading
March 24, 2021: HB1883 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor