+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On August 17, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0402
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Governor Approved
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 118-000-000
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Ryan Spain
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2021
- Second Reading
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 27, 2021
- Do Pass as Amended State Government; 006-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021
- Arrive in Senate
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with changes. Provides that Penicillium rubens (rather than chrysogenum) NRRL 1951 is designated the official State microbe of the State of Illinois.