+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Ethics & Elections Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Ethics & Elections Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 10 ILCS 5/1A-55 -
- 10 ILCS 5/17-13 - from Ch. 46, par. 17-13
- 10 ILCS 5/19-6 - from Ch. 46, par. 19-6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor